Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Pignatelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628¹Born
26 Jan 168254.0AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
1 Feb 168254.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lecce, Italy
10 Nov 169567.8DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Pignatelli
Bishop Michele Pignatelli C.R. (born 1628, died ) Bishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasalnuovo

  • a bishop for 13.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 244
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast