Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raffaele Cardinal Pierotti, O.P. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1836Born
9 Jan 185721.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
30 Nov 189660.9Elevated to Cardinal
3 Dec 189660.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
7 Sep 190569.6DiedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Pierotti
Raffaele Cardinal Pierotti O.P. (born , died ) Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorbano, Italy

  • a cardinal for 8.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Nov 1896

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018