Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Pierrefonds

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1500AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
13 Jan 1501AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
2 Sep 1510AppointedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Pierrefonds
Bishop Jean de Pierrefonds , Bishop of Meaux

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1500, Number 37*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast