Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Peverel, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Nov 1395AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
12 Jul 1398AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
4 Jul 1407AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
2 Mar 1419DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Peverel:
Bishop Thomas Peverel O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Worcester

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 60
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 529, and Page 380
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 83
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013