Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal Petrucci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Massa Marittima, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Teodoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1491Born
1 Oct 151019.7AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
1511²20.0AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
10 Mar 151120.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 151120.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Teodoro
27 Jul 151322.5ResignedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
22 Jun 151726.4ResignedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
16 Jul 151726.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Massa Marittima, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Petrucci
Alfonso Cardinal Petrucci (born 1491, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Massa Marittima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 6.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1511
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 237, and Page 305
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,510, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast