Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Pérez de Vega (López de Vega)

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598¹BornMondoñedo
10 May 164951.4AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
26 Sep 164951.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
18 Sep 165658.7AppointedBishop of León, Spain
14 Sep 165961.7DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Pérez de Vega (López de Vega):
Bishop Juan Pérez de Vega (López de Vega) (died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 218, and Page 349
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 179, Number 1,112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014