Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Pérez de Nueros

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jun 1654SelectedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
14 May 1655ConfirmedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
12 Feb 1656DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Pérez de Nueros:
Bishop Miguel Pérez de Nueros (died ) Bishop of Mallorca

Source(s):
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 185, Number 1,159
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013