Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Pérez de Humanares, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹BornPozuelo de Belmonte
9 Jun 165975.4AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
12 Feb 166379.1AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
23 Jun 166379.5DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Pérez de Humanares:
Bishop Alfonso Pérez de Humanares O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Cádiz

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 79
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 191, Number 1,197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013