Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia

Note/Previous Titular See: (Ordre du Christ)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562BornFeraz de Lima
159028.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 162765.9AppointedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
May 162866.3Ordained BishopBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
16 Aug 163068.6DiedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Miguel Pereira:
Bishop Miguel Pereira (died ) Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014