Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophe de Penmarch

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Feb 1474AppointedBishop of Dol, France
14 Jan 1478AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
17 Dec 1505DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

MicroData Summary for Christophe de Penmarch (VIAF: 253166028)
Bishop Christophe de Penmarch (died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 145, and Page 111
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1474, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Nov 2018

Quantcast