Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Martino Piña y Giménez

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1795Born
1821¹25.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 185155.4SelectedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
5 Sep 185155.8ConfirmedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
25 Nov 185156.0DiedBishop-Elect of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martino Piña y Giménez
Father Martino Piña y Giménez (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNájera

  • a priest for 30.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 458
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast