Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Niccol˛ Piccolomini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1628³BornSiena
2 Jun 170374.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Feb 170576.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 170677.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
2 Nov 171082.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Piccolomini:
Archbishop Niccol˛ Piccolomini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica

  • a priest for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 377
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1706, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015