Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus de Paula Paternò Castello

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Europus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1737Born
24 Jun 176023.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 177841.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus

MicroData Summary for Franciscus de Paula Paternò Castello
Bishop Franciscus de Paula Paternò Castello (born ) Titular Bishop of Europus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatane

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 211
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast