Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonio Paramo Somoza

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Lugo

Titular See: (died before being consecrated)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1731BornGoyŠn
10 Dec 178554.3AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
8 Mar 178654.5DiedBishop-Elect of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Paramo Somoza:
Priest Antonio Paramo Somoza (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Lugo

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013