Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismondo Pappacoda

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1456Born
3 Dec 149236.6AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
10 May 149943.1AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
21 Nov 152771.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 152771.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
Dec 1527²71.6ResignedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
3 Nov 153680.6DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigismondo Pappacoda
Bishop Sigismondo Pappacoda (born , died ) Bishop of Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Original)S. Giovanni Evangelista dei Pappacodi, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a cardinal for -.0 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Nov 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 319
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 265
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,492, Number 39*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast