Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Francesco Maria Cardinal Pamphilj

Deceased


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1622Born
14 Nov 164422.7Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 164422.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
21 Jan 164724.9ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
26 Jul 166644.4Died

MicroData Summary for Camillo Francesco Maria Pamphilj
Camillo Francesco Maria Cardinal Pamphilj (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaples, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.1 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Nov 1644

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018