Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot José Palmeiro Mendes, O.S.B.

Abbot Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1941 Born
8 Dec 197837.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jun 198442.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Oct 199251.0ConfirmedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
6 May 200361.5ResignedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Palmeiro Mendes
Abbot José Palmeiro Mendes O.S.B. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • prof: CB, 12 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast