Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Sforza Cardinal Pallavicino

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Salvatore in Lauro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1607Born
9 Apr 165749.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
29 Apr 165850.4Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 166053.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Salvatore in Lauro
5 Jun 166759.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Salvatore in Lauro

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Sforza Pallavicino
Francesco Maria Sforza Cardinal Pallavicino (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Salvatore in Lauro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 10.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Apr 1657

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast