Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Palenzuela, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Aug 1460AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
20 Oct 1469AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
17 Apr 1485DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Palenzuela
Bishop Alfonso Palenzuela O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Oviedo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 129, and Page 209
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1460, Number 43*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 31 Aug 2018

Quantcast