Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Polanco (Palanco), O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657¹BornCampo Real
1 Oct 171760.7AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
21 Nov 171760.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
1 Oct 172063.7DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Polanco (Palanco):
Bishop Francisco Polanco (Palanco) O.M. (died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for 2.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,066
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1700, Page 35, Number 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015