Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Cayetano Pacheco y Cárdenas

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Buenos Aires, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1689Born
19 Sep 174656.7AppointedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
3 Mar 174757.1DiedBishop-Elect of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Cayetano Pacheco y Cárdenas
Father José Cayetano Pacheco y Cárdenas (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArequipa

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast