Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leopold Ferdinand von Österreich

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Passau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1586BornGraz
14 Nov 159711.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Passau, Germany
159811.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
18 Aug 159912.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
25 Jul 160518.8SucceededBishop of Passau, Germany
24 Nov 160721.1SucceededBishop of Strasbourg, France
19 Apr 162639.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Passau, Germany
19 Apr 162639.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Strasbourg, France
13 Sep 163245.9DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Leopold Ferdinand von Österreich:
Priest Leopold Ferdinand von Österreich (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Passau

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013