Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio Orantes Vélez, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1516²Born
6 Mar 158165.1AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
15 May 158165.3Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
12 Oct 158468.7DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio Orantes Vélez (VIAF: 87497061)
Bishop Francisco Antonio Orantes Vélez O.F.M. Obs. (born 1516, died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuéllar, Diocese of Segovia
Ordained BishopMadrid
Death PlaceOviedo, Diocese of Oviedo

  • a bishop for 3.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 93, Number 583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 265
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast