Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Orueta Barasorda

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1652BornBilbao
3 Oct 170856.6AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
3 Mar 171664.0DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Orueta Barasorda:
Bishop Andrés Orueta Barasorda (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 403
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 27, Number 61
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015