Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Curzio Cardinal Origo

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1661Born
18 May 171251.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
26 Sep 171251.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 171251.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
26 Feb 171351.9Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
1 Jul 171655.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
20 Mar 172665.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eustachio
18 Mar 173776.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eustachio

MicroData Summary for Curzio Origo
Curzio Cardinal Origo (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eustachio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 24.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017