Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Oresme

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1377AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
26 Jan 1378Ordained BishopBishop of Lisieux, France
11 Jul 1382DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Oresme:
Bishop Nicolas Oresme (died ) Bishop of Lisieux

  • a bishop for 4.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 304
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013