Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Raphoe


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1758SelectedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
9 Jan 1759ConfirmedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
22 Apr 1759Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
1782¹DiedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philip O’Reilly:
Bishop Philip O’Reilly (died 1782) Bishop of Raphoe

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015