Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Ortiz de Vilhegas

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
1491AppointedBishop of Tanger (Tangier), Morocco
29 Jul 1491AppointedBishop of Tanger (Tangier), Morocco
3 May 1500AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
4 May 1500AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
27 Jun 1505AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
1519DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Diego de Ortiz de Vilhegas
Bishop Diego de Ortiz de Vilhegas (died 1519) Bishop of Viseu

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 163
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 245, and Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast