Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pachomiusz Woyna Orański

Deceased

Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus

Coadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹Born
1637²38.0AppointedBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
16 Mar 165253.2SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
6 May 165253.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
23 Jun 1653³54.4DiedBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pachomiusz Woyna Orański
Bishop Pachomiusz Woyna Orański (born 1599, died ) Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2015, 2, 13
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 250, and Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast