Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giulio Oradini

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Perugia


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Apr 1562AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
10 Sep 1564ResignedBishop-Elect of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Oradini:
Father Giulio Oradini , Former Bishop-Elect of Perugia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 272
  • not b: CB, 5 Feb 2015
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015