Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Henricus Norbertus (Harrie) van Oort, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Benkoelen, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1888Born
19 Jan 192738.0AppointedPrefect of Benkoelen, Indonesia
193445.0ResignedPrefect of Benkoelen, Indonesia
27 Nov 194455.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of Benkoelen, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Henricus Norbertus (Harrie) van Oort
Father Henricus Norbertus (Harrie) van Oort S.C.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Benkoelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZwolle, Netherlands
Death PlaceInterment Camp, Muntok

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: CB, 21 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Dec 2018

Quantcast