Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Olivieri

Deceased

Bishop of Strongoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660¹Born
25 Jun 170646.4AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
27 Jun 170646.4Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
Feb 1719³59.0DiedBishop of Strongoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Olivieri
Bishop Thomas Olivieri (born 1660, died Feb 1719) Bishop of Strongoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCutro
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 364
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 30
  • ob: CB, 27 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast