Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jeremiah Francis O’Flynn

Deceased

Priest


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1788Born
1813²24.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Mar 181324.2Ordained PriestPriest
1816²27.0AppointedPrefect of New Holland, Australia
1819²30.0ResignedPrefect of New Holland, Australia
8 Feb 183142.1DiedPriest

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jeremiah Francis O’Flynn
Father Jeremiah Francis O’Flynn (born , died ) Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCounty Kerry, Ireland

  • a priest for 17.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 17 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017