Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas O’Fihely

Deceased

Bishop of Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jun 1547AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
16 Oct 1547Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
30 Aug 1555AppointedBishop of Leighlin, Ireland
31 Mar 1567DiedBishop of Leighlin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas O’Fihely
Bishop Thomas O’Fihely (died ) Bishop of Leighlin

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 94, and Page 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1547, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 24 Sep 2017