Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Terence O’Donnelly

Deceased

Bishop of Derry


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Aug 1711AppointedVicar Apostolic of Down and Connor, Ireland
1717¹ResignedVicar Apostolic of Down and Connor, Ireland
21 Dec 1719SelectedBishop of Derry, Ireland
5 Jan 1720ConfirmedBishop of Derry, Ireland
27 Mar 1720³Ordained BishopBishop of Derry, Ireland
1726¹DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Terence O’Donnelly:
Bishop Terence O’Donnelly (died 1726) Bishop of Derry

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 183, and Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015