Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Giorgio Odescalchi

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1564²Born
10 May 159632.3AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
29 May 159935.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
26 May 161046.4AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
7 May 162056.3DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giorgio Odescalchi (VIAF: 89330654)
Bishop Pietro Giorgio Odescalchi (born 1564, died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona
Ordained BishopSan Pietro in Montorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.9 years

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,822
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369, and Page 77
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast