Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Nugent, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jun 1530AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
5 Nov 1540RemovedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
1550²DiedBishop Emeritus of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Edmund Nugent
Bishop Edmund Nugent C.R.S.A. (died 1550) Bishop Emeritus of Kilmore

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 217
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1530, Number 21*
  • b: CB, 27 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast