Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspar Vicente Novella

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Sep 1575AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
6 Oct 1578AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
24 Aug 1586DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Vicente Novella:
Archbishop Gaspar Vicente Novella (died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013