Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrico Cardinal Noris, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1631Born
12 Dec 169564.2Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jan 169664.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
6 Mar 170068.5AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
6 Mar 170068.5AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
23 Feb 170472.4DiedLibrarian of the Vatican Library

MicroData Summary for Enrico Noris
Enrico Cardinal Noris O.S.A. (born , died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy

  • a cardinal for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast