Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Nix von Hoheneck

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1411Born
17 Sep 145948.7AppointedBishop of Speyer, Germany
4 Jul 146453.5ResignedBishop of Speyer, Germany
8 Sep 146756.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Nix von Hoheneck:
Bishop Johannes Nix von Hoheneck (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Speyer

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013