Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Finnboge Niklasson

Deceased

Bishop of Bjørgvin (Bergen)


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1462SelectedBishop of Bjørgvin (Bergen), Norway
25 Feb 1462ConfirmedBishop of Bjørgvin (Bergen), Norway
15 May 1474DiedBishop of Bjørgvin (Bergen), Norway

MicroData Summary for Finnboge Niklasson:
Bishop Finnboge Niklasson (died ) Bishop of Bjørgvin (Bergen)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015