Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Martin von Neuzelle (Graf), O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Zama Major


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1678BornWellmitz
1697²18.8ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
1703²24.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
2 May 173254.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Major
27 Sep 174163.6DiedBishop-Elect of Zama Major

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin von Neuzelle (Graf):
Father Martin von Neuzelle (Graf) O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Zama Major

  • a priest for 38.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 449
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015