Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pier Luigi Nava, S.M.M.

Under Secretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

Priest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1953 Born
28 Apr 197824.8Perpetual VowsMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
17 Mar 197925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
27 Nov 201865.3AppointedUnder Secretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

MicroData Summary for Pier Luigi Nava
Father Pier Luigi Nava S.M.M. (born ) Under Secretary of Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeffe

Please contact the Father through the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast