Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Stanislaw Narkustki

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1564AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
13 Feb 1565DiedBishop-Elect of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Narkustki
Father Stanislaw Narkustki (died ) Bishop-Elect of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 239
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564
  • d: CB, 27 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast