Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Narducci

Deceased

Bishop of Urbino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jul 1523AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Urbino, Italy
27 Aug 1523SucceededBishop of Urbino, Italy
14 Jan 1540DiedBishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Narducci
Bishop Giacomo Narducci (died ) Bishop of Urbino

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 323
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1523, Number 31*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 10 Jun 2018

Quantcast