Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Narbonne, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mâcon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Dec 1531AppointedBishop of Sisteron, France
28 Sep 1541AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
6 Oct 1542DiedBishop of Mâcon, France

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Narbonne
Bishop Antonio de Narbonne O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Mâcon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 301, and Page 238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast