Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Demetrii Napragyi

Deceased

Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Bishop of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1563¹Born
7 Jan 160037.0AppointedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
27 Jan 161047.0AppointedBishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
27 Jan 161047.0AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
5 Mar 161956.1DiedBishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Demetrii Napragyi
Bishop Demetrii Napragyi (born 1563, died ) Bishop of Kalocsa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 156, and Page 207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 317, and Page 341
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 365
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 38
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018