Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Augustinus Nachtwey, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1869Born
1891²21.9First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1892²22.9Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
14 Jul 189526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
Dec 1901³32.8AppointedPrefect of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia
1908²38.9ResignedPrefect of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia
7 Jun 195081.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustinus Nachtwey
Father Augustinus Nachtwey O.M.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeulingen bei Dudenstadt
Death PlaceImmerath

  • a priest for 54.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge, 2,017, 5, 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast