Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Félicien Muvara

Deceased

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Butare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1950²BornMgamugeyo
7 Sep 197626.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 198838.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Butare, Rwanda
15 Dec 198838.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunudruma
Feb 1989³39.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Butare, Rwanda
Feb 1989³39.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Thunudruma
May 1994²44.3DiedPriest of Butare, Rwanda

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Félicien Muvara (VIAF: 48366968)
Father Félicien Muvara (born 1950, died May 1994) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Butare

  • a priest for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 22 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 May 2016