Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompeo Musacchi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Parma, Italy

Titular Bishop of Lydda


Events

DateEventTitle
11 May 1524AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Parma, Italy
11 May 1524AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
26 Sep 1525Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Musacchi
Bishop Pompeo Musacchi , Auxiliary Bishop of Parma

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Parma, Diocese of Parma

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 225
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1525, Number 13
  • c3: CB, 10 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jun 2018

Quantcast